House | 05/29/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Filed |