Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2053 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

                    H.R. No. 2053


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of Sandra Herman Valls of Port Aransas on December 31, 2016,
 at the age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Dorothy Sue Herman and Francis L.
 Herman Jr., the former Sandra Herman was born in Owensboro,
 Kentucky, on August 21, 1941; she was raised in Ingleside and Corpus
 Christi and graduated from W. B. Ray High School; while attending
 Del Mar College, Ms. Herman met Richard Valls, whom she married on
 June 17, 1961; the couple became the proud parents of four children,
 Linda Marie, Cerise, Richard, and Laurence, and with the passing
 years, their family grew to include eight treasured grandchildren;
 and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Valls was instrumental in the success of the
 family businesses, and, after raising her children, she earned a
 bachelor's degree from Corpus Christi State University; a devout
 Catholic, this esteemed Texan possessed a genuine concern for the
 welfare of others, which was evident in her active participation in
 numerous civic and charitable organizations; when she was not busy
 being a nurturing mother, devoted "Gigi" to her grandchildren, and
 trusted friend, she enjoyed indulging her adventurous spirit and
 passion for learning through travel, reading, and a deep
 appreciation of art; and
 WHEREAS, Those who were privileged to share in Sandra Valls's
 love and friendship will always remember her with great tenderness
 and affection; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Sandra Herman Valls
 and that sincere sympathy be extended to the members of her family:
 to her husband, Richard Valls; to her children, Linda Marie Valls,
 Cerise Valls Weeks and her husband, Jason, Richard R. Valls Jr. and
 his wife, Brenda, and Laurence A. W. Valls and his wife, Tiffany; to
 her grandchildren, Austin and Avery Valls, Morgan, Richard, and
 Winston Weeks, and Roselyn, Riley, and Reese Valls; to her brother,
 Richard Herman; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sandra
 Herman Valls.
 Hunter
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2053 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House