H.R. No. 2257 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, June 12, 2017, marks the 30th anniversary of President Ronald Reagan's historic speech at the Berlin Wall, in which he boldly challenged the Communist rulers of the Soviet Union to tear down the wall and reunify East and West Berlin; and WHEREAS, In one of the darkest episodes of the Cold War, the Communist government of East Germany began building on August 13, 1961, what they called an "Antifaschistischer Schutzwall," or "antifascist bulwark," across the center of the divided city of Berlin; the government claimed the wall was to keep Westerners from entering and undermining the Socialist state, but in reality, it was intended to keep East Berlin's disillusioned residents from escaping to the West; and WHEREAS, A makeshift wall was completed in two weeks, but it was eventually replaced by a structure of reinforced concrete, 12 feet tall, 4 feet wide, and topped by an enormous pipe that made it almost impossible to climb over; behind the wall, East German officials created a floodlit no-man's-land called the "Death Strip," which was guarded by attack dogs, trip-wire machine guns, and soldiers with orders to shoot on sight; and WHEREAS, Over the years, many desperate East Germans tried to get over, under, or around this terrifying barrier; at least 171 people were killed in the attempt, but somehow more than 5,000 East Germans, including 600 border guards, managed to escape; these brave individuals employed such extreme methods as jumping out of windows next to the wall, climbing over barbed wire, crawling through sewers, driving at high speed through unfortified checkpoints, or even floating over the boundary in hot air balloons; and WHEREAS, By the 1980s, the Berlin Wall was firmly fixed in the public imagination as a symbol of the failure of Communism and the desperate attempt of a foundering state to imprison its own citizens; the wall and the ideology it represented were roundly condemned by many world leaders, including Pope John Paul II, British prime minister Margaret Thatcher, Polish Solidarity leader Lech Walesa, and the Czech writer and dissident Vaclav Havel, all of whom denounced Communism and the abuse of fundamental human rights taking place in the countries behind the Iron Curtain; and WHEREAS, Towering among these champions of liberty was President Ronald Reagan, who helped lead the effort to defeat Communism, and in June 1987, he traveled to Germany in order to speak at the Brandenburg Gate, only 100 yards from the wall itself; in his preparations for this monumental event, White House speechwriter Peter Robinson visited Berlin and spoke with Germans whose families had been torn apart by the wall, and he was inspired to include a line addressed directly to the general secretary of the Soviet Union, demanding the destruction of the wall; and WHEREAS, This appeal was controversial even within the Reagan administration, particularly among the staff of the State Department; in the final moments before the speech, as he was riding in his limousine to the wall, President Reagan told his deputy chief of staff Kenneth Duberstein that he was going to deliver the line anyway, saying with a smile, "The boys at State are going to kill me, but it's the right thing to do"; shortly thereafter, he spoke before a large assembly of Germans, and the crowd roared its appreciation when he reached the now-famous line, "Mr. Gorbachev, tear down this wall!"; and WHEREAS, A spark was lit, and only a few years later, the world saw the rapid collapse of Communism, not only in Germany and Eastern Europe, but eventually in the Soviet Union itself; at midnight on November 9, 1989, the East German authorities finally threw open the checkpoints along the wall, and millions of Berliners from both sides came together in what one historian called "the greatest street party in the history of the world"; enthusiastic Germans climbed the wall and danced on top of it or attacked it with hammers and pickaxes; over the coming months, this symbol of tyranny was reduced to rubble, signaling the defeat of Communism and oppression and the triumph of democracy and independence; and WHEREAS, In the relentless march of human events, there are rare moments in which a single man's eloquence and moral conviction can inspire millions and embody a new spirit of liberty, and Ronald Reagan's daring address in Berlin was one such moment, worthy of remembrance by people around the world for as long as the love of freedom endures; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas Legislature hereby commemorate the 30th anniversary of President Reagan's speech at the Berlin Wall on June 12, 1987. Price ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 2257 was adopted by the House on May 25, 2017, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House