Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2504 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2017

                    H.R. No. 2504


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of David
 Earl LaRue of Midlothian, who passed away on May 8, 2017, at the age
 of 77; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Elvis and Linnie LaRue, David LaRue was
 born on September 11, 1939, in Dallas County; he grew up in the
 company of three siblings, Danna, Marsha, and Lavon, and attended
 Midlothian High School, where he earned his diploma in 1959; he went
 on to work for General Motors in Arlington, enjoying a successful
 career that spanned three decades, until his retirement in 1995;
 and
 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. LaRue became a Master
 Mason in 1985 and joined Midlothian Masonic Lodge No. 584; he was a
 founding member of the Cowboy Church of Ellis County and played the
 fiddle for several years as part of the original Cowboy Church Band;
 and
 WHEREAS, On July 8, 1960, Mr. LaRue married the former Gwen
 Curts, with whom he shared more than half a century of love and
 companionship; he was the proud father of three sons, Alan, Todd,
 and Jeff, and with the passing years, he had the pleasure of
 welcoming into his family seven grandchildren, Heather, Katy,
 Mallory, Meredith, Justin, Jeremy, and Lash, and nine
 great-grandchildren, Makayla, Kyler, Kyndal, Hunter, Allyson,
 Cayden, Jarrod, Mason, and Davis; and
 WHEREAS, David LaRue led a full and generous life, and those
 who were fortunate enough to know him will forever carry him close
 in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of David Earl LaRue and
 extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of David
 LaRue.
 Wray
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2504 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House