Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2511 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2017

                            H.R. No. 2511


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever feel the loss of
 Texas Department of Public Safety Trooper David Irvine Rucker, who
 died in the line of duty on September 29, 1981, at the age of 37; and
 WHEREAS, Trooper Rucker was shot and killed during the course
 of a traffic stop; he left behind a wife and three children; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Brownsville on October 21, 1943, David
 Rucker was the son of Bracht and Hazel Dawn Rucker; he grew up in
 Homestead, Florida, where he graduated from South Dade High School
 in 1963; he studied liberal arts at Texas Southmost College in
 Brownsville and went on to graduate from the Dade County Police
 Academy; from 1966 to 1968, he served as a patrol officer in the
 Homestead Police Department; and
 WHEREAS, On September 15, 1969, Mr. Rucker took the oath of
 the Texas State Highway Patrol; he was appointed patrolman in 1973,
 and that same year, he was promoted to patrolman II; at the time of
 his death, he was assigned to Region 3 in Port Isabel; and
 WHEREAS, In 1997, a memorial was placed at the site of Trooper
 Rucker's death, and a street was renamed in his honor in Isla Blanca
 Park on South Padre Island; the Carrizales-Rucker Detention Center
 near Olmito bears his name, and in 2012, the Texas Department of
 Public Safety named a river patrol boat in Trooper Rucker's memory;
 and
 WHEREAS, Though David Rucker was taken far too soon, his
 legacy of public service and devotion to his family will continue to
 inspire all those who hold him close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of David Irvine Rucker
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of David
 Irvine Rucker.
 Lucio III
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2511 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House