Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2526 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2017

                    H.R. No. 2526


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Henry Albert Phillips Jr. on July 1, 2016, at the age of
 95; and
 WHEREAS, Hank Phillips was born in Providence, Rhode Island,
 on April 6, 1921, to Henry and Freda Phillips; a graduate of East
 Providence High School, he was working at a local steel mill when
 the attack on Pearl Harbor brought the United States into World War
 II, and soon thereafter he enlisted in the U.S. Army Air Corps; he
 was deployed overseas in September 1943, and over the next year, he
 piloted 150 missions across the Himalayas, for which he was
 accorded two Distinguished Flying Crosses and six other medals; he
 continued his military career after the war, serving on 14 bases
 across the United States before retiring from the air force in 1962;
 and
 WHEREAS, After returning to civilian life, Mr. Phillips
 enjoyed a career as a data systems manager for the City of Tampa,
 Florida, that spanned a decade and a half; in retirement, he became
 an avid golfer and went on to win the 1978 Florida State Golf
 Association Senior Four-Ball Championship as well as a host of
 other golf tournaments around the nation; in addition, he found
 time to recount his breadth of experiences in his 2012
 autobiography, Commander in the Sky; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Phillips married the love of his life, the
 former Ollie Twilley, on February 15, 1945, and over the course of
 more than seven decades together, the couple were blessed with a
 fine family that included three daughters, Tricia Browne-Ferrigno,
 Deborah MacIntosh, and Pamella Anderson, as well as five
 grandchildren, Allison, Parke, Phillip, Shawn, and Paige, and three
 great-grandchildren, James, Katherine, and Arden; and
 WHEREAS, Coming of age during World War II, Hank Phillips
 possessed the courage and initiative that defined the finest
 members of that generation, and he leaves behind a record of service
 that his loved ones can remember with pride; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Henry Albert Phillips
 Jr. and extend heartfelt sympathy to his relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Hank
 Phillips.
 Wilson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2526 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House