Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2661 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            H.R. No. 2661


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Residents of Bremond were deeply saddened by the
 death of civic leader and Bremond Press publisher Betty Yezak on
 July 24, 2016, at the age of 90; and
 WHEREAS, Born near Wheelock on December 20, 1925, the former
 Elizabeth Adele Supak was the youngest of the six children of
 sharecroppers Thomas and Louise Supak; her grandparents were Czech
 immigrants, and she spoke English as her second language when she
 started school; after graduating from Franklin High School, she
 became the first member of her family to attend college, with
 financial help from her older sister; she worked as a grill cook at
 the student union while completing her bachelor's degree in English
 at Texas State College for Women, and during World War II, she held
 a summer job as a forklift operator at a bomb factory in McGregor;
 and
 WHEREAS, She began teaching high school English in
 Pleasanton, and her brother introduced her to his boss, then-State
 Representative Herman Yezak; the couple married at St. Mary's
 Catholic Church in Bremond on October 5, 1949, and they were blessed
 with two daughters, Patricia "Pisha" and Jennifer, and two sons,
 Robert and George; while her children were young, Mrs. Yezak
 supported them in many extracurricular activities; she became an
 ardent fan of the Bremond Tigers, and in 61 years she attended every
 regular season football game and missed only four playoff games;
 and
 WHEREAS, At the end of the 1950s, the Yezaks purchased the
 weekly Bremond Press, and following her husband's death in 1986,
 Mrs. Yezak continued to lead it, with increasing help from her son,
 George; she wrote a column, "The B.Y. Line," in every edition for 29
 years, sharing her observations and, in keeping with her iron
 commitment to the First Amendment, sometimes rankling certain
 readers with her strongly held opinions; she also worked from 1957
 to 1971 as a Star Route mail carrier and loved getting to know and
 assist all manner of people along Route 3; subsequently, she served
 for eight years as a Child Protective Services worker in Franklin,
 and following the death of her husband, she completed his term as
 justice of the peace for Robertson County Precinct 4; in addition,
 she raised cattle with her son George; and
 WHEREAS, A devout Catholic, Mrs. Yezak was a CYO sponsor, CCD
 teacher, bazaar volunteer, and lector at St. Mary's; she served the
 wider community as a member of the Bremond Chamber of Commerce and
 of the committee that launched the Polish Day festival in 1988;
 moreover, she was the Democratic Party precinct chair and an
 election worker for many years; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Yezak took great pride in her seven
 grandchildren, Eliot, Job, Kie, Menzie, Jackson, Todd, and Yancie,
 and her great-granddaughter, Georgia; she enjoyed watching Texas
 A&M and Dallas Cowboys football games, going out to eat, playing 42
 dominos, doing crosswords, and following current events with MSNBC,
 CNN, the Waco Tribune-Herald, The Eagle, and the Dallas Morning
 News; moreover, she liked to mow the yard, check on the cows, and
 take care of her four cats, Scrap, Smug, T-Face, and Yellowneck, as
 well as her "part-time yard dog," Clyde, whose owner, Tinka Hopcus,
 was a dear neighbor; and
 WHEREAS, Betty Yezak made a positive difference in her
 beloved community, and although she is sadly missed by her family,
 her friends, and her loyal readers, those who were privileged to
 know her will forever remember her warmth, enthusiasm, and profound
 sense of community; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Betty Yezak and extend
 sincere condolences to all who mourn her passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Betty
 Yezak.
 Kacal
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2661 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House