House | 02/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 328 | |
House | 02/02/2017 | Filed |