Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR333

Caption

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The bill emphasizes local pride and community engagement, showcasing Pearland's unique character as it benefits from its proximity to larger urban centers like Houston. By acknowledging Pearland Day, the resolution reinforces the importance of local identities within the context of state politics, allowing residents to feel recognized and valued. This type of legislative acknowledgment can enhance civic engagement and community spirit, promoting further development and identity for Pearland as a distinctive Texas city.

Summary

H.R. No. 333 is a resolution recognizing February 22, 2017, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol. The bill celebrates the city of Pearland, highlighting its rich history and the significance of its residents gathering in Austin. Established in 1893, Pearland has a storied past that includes overcoming natural disasters and fostering growth through oil and gas discoveries. The resolution serves as a platform for the Pearland community to showcase their achievements and pride in their city while fostering connections with state legislators.

Sentiment

The sentiment regarding H.R. No. 333 is overwhelmingly positive, as it symbolizes recognition and celebration for the community of Pearland. Legislators and residents likely view the resolution as a validation of their efforts to foster a vibrant and growing community. The acknowledgment of such local events in the Capitol fosters goodwill between the city and state representatives, showcasing a collaborative spirit within Texas's governance.

Contention

There does not appear to be notable contention surrounding H.R. No. 333, as resolutions like this typically lack significant dissent. They serve mainly to celebrate local communities and promote pride among residents, rather than proposing controversial policy changes or legislative actions. The absence of opposing views suggests a consensus on the importance of recognizing local culture and achievements within the state legislature.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR694

Congratulating E. J. "Joe" King on his retirement as Brazoria County Judge.

TX HB2895

Relating to authorizing the sale of certain real property in Brazoria County by the Texas Board of Criminal Justice.

TX HR738

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR695

Recognizing March 3, 2015, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR948

Recognizing March 19, 2013, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SB2028

Relating to the creation of additional judicial districts composed of Brazoria County.

TX HB3202

Relating to authorizing the transfer of certain real property held by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

TX HR172

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.