House | 02/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 440 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 440 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 12/28/2016 | Filed |