Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR492 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R11481 BK-D
 By: VanDeaver H.R. No. 492


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, February 23, 2017, marks the 100th anniversary of
 the signing of the Smith-Hughes Act, the first major federal
 legislation to support the teaching of agriculture and other
 vocational subjects in high school; and
 WHEREAS, During the late 19th and early 20th centuries, the
 need for vocational and technical education to augment academic
 study was increasingly recognized by teachers, agriculturists,
 home economists, and industry leaders; in 1914, the United States
 Congress established the Commission on National Aid to Vocational
 Education, which concluded that federal funding was necessary to
 ensure the success of such programs; and
 WHEREAS, Based on the recommendations of the commission,
 Senator Hoke Smith of Georgia introduced Senate Bill 703 on
 December 7, 1915, and on February 10, 1916, Representative Dudley
 Hughes laid out a companion bill, House Bill 11250; Senator Smith's
 bill enjoyed support from both chambers of Congress as well as from
 President Woodrow Wilson, who urged Congress to take action on it;
 and
 WHEREAS, A diverse range of interest groups, including
 industrialists, labor unions, and agricultural scientists, were
 united in their endorsement of the legislation; support for the
 measure was further intensified by the perception that Germany,
 then engaged in the Great War, had outstripped America in
 developing an advanced workforce to sustain its agricultural and
 industrial might; and
 WHEREAS, On February 17, 1917, Senate Bill 703--now known as
 the Smith-Hughes Act--was approved by Congress in a bipartisan
 vote, and on February 23, President Wilson signed the bill into law;
 Texas state senator Claude Hudspeth of El Paso subsequently
 introduced a bill to accept the benefits of the federal act, which
 was approved by the 35th Texas Legislature on May 8, 1917; and
 WHEREAS, Today, 15 million young Americans, including some
 1.2 million Texans, are enrolled in occupational courses in 16
 cutting-edge career areas; their experiences in those programs are
 empowering them to succeed in postsecondary education and in the
 free-market economy, both as employees and as entrepreneurs; in
 addition, the advent of vocational education has led to the
 establishment of a range of youth leadership development
 organizations, including FFA, SkillsUSA, HOSA, and the Future
 Business Leaders of America, which are preparing their members to
 become engaged citizens and effective leaders in the work of
 self-government, the foundation of this constitutional republic;
 and
 WHEREAS, In the century since the passage of the landmark
 Smith-Hughes Act, vocational education has opened the doors of
 opportunity for countless youth and contributed significantly to
 the strength and prosperity of this nation; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate the 100th anniversary of the signing
 of the Smith-Hughes Act and encourage Texans to learn more about the
 fine work being done by outstanding career and technical teachers
 in communities across the state.