Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR492 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 492


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, February 23, 2017, marks the 100th anniversary of
 the signing of the Smith-Hughes Act, the first major federal
 legislation to support the teaching of agriculture and other
 vocational subjects in high school; and
 WHEREAS, During the late 19th and early 20th centuries, the
 need for vocational and technical education to augment academic
 study was increasingly recognized by teachers, agriculturists,
 home economists, and industry leaders; in 1914, the United States
 Congress established the Commission on National Aid to Vocational
 Education, which concluded that federal funding was necessary to
 ensure the success of such programs; and
 WHEREAS, Based on the recommendations of the commission,
 Senator Hoke Smith of Georgia introduced Senate Bill 703 on
 December 7, 1915, and on February 10, 1916, Representative Dudley
 Hughes laid out a companion bill, House Bill 11250; Senator Smith's
 bill enjoyed support from both chambers of Congress as well as from
 President Woodrow Wilson, who urged Congress to take action on it;
 and
 WHEREAS, A diverse range of interest groups, including
 industrialists, labor unions, and agricultural scientists, were
 united in their endorsement of the legislation; support for the
 measure was further intensified by the perception that Germany,
 then engaged in the Great War, had outstripped America in
 developing an advanced workforce to sustain its agricultural and
 industrial might; and
 WHEREAS, On February 17, 1917, Senate Bill 703--now known as
 the Smith-Hughes Act--was approved by Congress in a bipartisan
 vote, and on February 23, President Wilson signed the bill into law;
 Texas state senator Claude Hudspeth of El Paso subsequently
 introduced a bill to accept the benefits of the federal act, which
 was approved by the 35th Texas Legislature on May 8, 1917; and
 WHEREAS, Today, 15 million young Americans, including some
 1.2 million Texans, are enrolled in occupational courses in 16
 cutting-edge career areas; their experiences in those programs are
 empowering them to succeed in postsecondary education and in the
 free-market economy, both as employees and as entrepreneurs; in
 addition, the advent of vocational education has led to the
 establishment of a range of youth leadership development
 organizations, including FFA, SkillsUSA, HOSA, and the Future
 Business Leaders of America, which are preparing their members to
 become engaged citizens and effective leaders in the work of
 self-government, the foundation of this constitutional republic;
 and
 WHEREAS, In the century since the passage of the landmark
 Smith-Hughes Act, vocational education has opened the doors of
 opportunity for countless youth and contributed significantly to
 the strength and prosperity of this nation; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate the 100th anniversary of the signing
 of the Smith-Hughes Act and encourage Texans to learn more about the
 fine work being done by outstanding career and technical teachers
 in communities across the state.
 VanDeaver
 Straus Goldman Oliverson Straus Goldman Oliverson
Straus Goldman Oliverson
 Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega
Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega
 Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie
Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie
 Alvarado Gooden Parker Alvarado Gooden Parker
Alvarado Gooden Parker
 Anchia Guerra Paul Anchia Guerra Paul
Anchia Guerra Paul
 Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez
Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez
 Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan
Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan
 Arévalo Hefner Phillips Arévalo Hefner Phillips
Arévalo Hefner Phillips
 Ashby Hernandez Pickett Ashby Hernandez Pickett
Ashby Hernandez Pickett
 Bailes Herrero Price Bailes Herrero Price
Bailes Herrero Price
 Bell Hinojosa Raney Bell Hinojosa Raney
Bell Hinojosa Raney
 Bernal Holland Raymond Bernal Holland Raymond
Bernal Holland Raymond
 Biedermann Howard Reynolds Biedermann Howard Reynolds
Biedermann Howard Reynolds
 Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Blanco Huberty Rinaldi
Blanco Huberty Rinaldi
 Bohac Hunter Roberts Bohac Hunter Roberts
Bohac Hunter Roberts
 Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar
Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar
 Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis
Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis
 Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
 Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burns Johnson of Harris Rose
Burns Johnson of Harris Rose
 Burrows Kacal Sanford Burrows Kacal Sanford
Burrows Kacal Sanford
 Button Keough Schaefer Button Keough Schaefer
Button Keough Schaefer
 Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Cain King of Hemphill Schofield
Cain King of Hemphill Schofield
 Canales King of Parker Schubert Canales King of Parker Schubert
Canales King of Parker Schubert
 Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen
Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen
 Clardy Klick Sheffield Clardy Klick Sheffield
Clardy Klick Sheffield
 Coleman Koop Shine Coleman Koop Shine
Coleman Koop Shine
 Collier Krause Simmons Collier Krause Simmons
Collier Krause Simmons
 Cook Kuempel Smithee Cook Kuempel Smithee
Cook Kuempel Smithee
 Cortez Lambert Springer Cortez Lambert Springer
Cortez Lambert Springer
 Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Cosper Landgraf Stephenson
Cosper Landgraf Stephenson
 Craddick Lang Stickland Craddick Lang Stickland
Craddick Lang Stickland
 Cyrier Larson Stucky Cyrier Larson Stucky
Cyrier Larson Stucky
 Dale Laubenberg Swanson Dale Laubenberg Swanson
Dale Laubenberg Swanson
 Darby Leach Thierry Darby Leach Thierry
Darby Leach Thierry
 Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria
Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria
 Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris
Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris
 Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Dean Lucio III Tinderholt
Dean Lucio III Tinderholt
 Deshotel Martinez Turner Deshotel Martinez Turner
Deshotel Martinez Turner
 Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dukes Metcalf Uresti
Dukes Metcalf Uresti
 Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Dutton Meyer VanDeaver
Dutton Meyer VanDeaver
 Elkins Miller Villalba Elkins Miller Villalba
Elkins Miller Villalba
 Faircloth Minjarez Vo Faircloth Minjarez Vo
Faircloth Minjarez Vo
 Fallon Moody Walle Fallon Moody Walle
Fallon Moody Walle
 Farrar Morrison White Farrar Morrison White
Farrar Morrison White
 Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
 Frank Murphy Workman Frank Murphy Workman
Frank Murphy Workman
 Frullo Murr Wray Frullo Murr Wray
Frullo Murr Wray
 Geren Neave Wu Geren Neave Wu
Geren Neave Wu
 Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler
Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler
 Giddings Oliveira Zerwas Giddings Oliveira Zerwas
Giddings Oliveira Zerwas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 492 was adopted by the House on February
 23, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus Goldman Oliverson

Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega

Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie

Alvarado Gooden Parker

Anchia Guerra Paul

Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez

Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan

Arévalo Hefner Phillips

Ashby Hernandez Pickett

Bailes Herrero Price

Bell Hinojosa Raney

Bernal Holland Raymond

Biedermann Howard Reynolds

Blanco Huberty Rinaldi

Bohac Hunter Roberts

Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar

Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis

Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.

Burns Johnson of Harris Rose

Burrows Kacal Sanford

Button Keough Schaefer

Cain King of Hemphill Schofield

Canales King of Parker Schubert

Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen

Clardy Klick Sheffield

Coleman Koop Shine

Collier Krause Simmons

Cook Kuempel Smithee

Cortez Lambert Springer

Cosper Landgraf Stephenson

Craddick Lang Stickland

Cyrier Larson Stucky

Dale Laubenberg Swanson

Darby Leach Thierry

Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria

Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris

Dean Lucio III Tinderholt

Deshotel Martinez Turner

Dukes Metcalf Uresti

Dutton Meyer VanDeaver

Elkins Miller Villalba

Faircloth Minjarez Vo

Fallon Moody Walle

Farrar Morrison White

Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson

Frank Murphy Workman

Frullo Murr Wray

Geren Neave Wu

Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler

Giddings Oliveira Zerwas