Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR58 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 58


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Texans and many other Americans are joining with our
 neighbors south of the Rio Grande on May 5, 2018, to celebrate Cinco
 de Mayo, a holiday honoring the legendary Mexican victory over the
 French at the Battle of Puebla in 1862; and
 WHEREAS, After chafing under Spanish rule for several
 centuries, Mexico declared itself a free and independent nation in
 1821, but the transition from colonialism was a difficult one, and
 the mid-19th century saw the young nation struggling to maintain a
 stable government; in the winter of 1861-1862, with the central
 government in Mexico severely weakened, France, Britain, and Spain
 jointly occupied the port of Veracruz for the avowed purpose of
 securing the payment of debt owed by Mexico to European creditors;
 and
 WHEREAS, When it became evident that France actually intended
 to conquer Mexico, Britain and Spain began withdrawing their troops
 on April 11, 1862; some two weeks later, the French army began to
 march on Mexico City; its advance, however, was dramatically
 checked at the town of Puebla, where the Mexican general Ignacio
 Zaragoza Seguin, leading a small, poorly armed, and greatly
 outnumbered force, defeated the French on May 5, 1862; and
 WHEREAS, That victory at Puebla was an important event in the
 history of the Republic of Mexico, for by repelling one of the
 world's finest military forces, the courageous Mexican soldiers not
 only struck a blow against foreign domination but also fired a
 powerful sense of national pride; and
 WHEREAS, Today, the anniversary of the Battle of Puebla is
 observed in many U.S. cities as well as in Mexico; Cinco de Mayo
 celebrations in Texas enjoy a particular resonance because General
 Zaragoza was a Tejano, born in Presidio La Bahia, near present-day
 Goliad; the determination of this able officer and his men to defend
 "la patria," the homeland, is as inspiring now as it was more than
 150 years ago; and
 WHEREAS, Cinco de Mayo festivities pay homage to one of the
 notable events in Mexico's past while highlighting that country's
 music, food, art, and cherished traditions, and the annual
 celebration has become a special part of the rich cultural fabric of
 the Lone Star State; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate Cinco de Mayo, 2018, and encourage
 its observance around the state.
 Alonzo
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 58 was adopted by the House on
 February 23, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House