House | 03/13/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 481 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |