House | 03/20/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 712 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 712 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |