Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR711 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/17/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 711


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Madren Boyce Whatley of Midlothian on January 22, 2017,
 at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, "Buddy" Whatley was born on October 12, 1931, to
 Willis and Ruby Whatley, and he grew up with the companionship of
 his twin sister, Joyce; a member of the DeKalb High School Class of
 1949, he graduated from Tyler Commercial College the following
 year; while there, he met the love of his life, the former Darline
 Rawson, and they were married on December 15, 1951; over the course
 of six and a half decades together, the couple were blessed with
 four children, Rhonda, Boyce, Jim, and Kyle, and three
 grandchildren, Jordan, Kelsie, and Hayden; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Whatley enjoyed a long and fulfilling career
 with General Electric, and after retiring, he went on to establish a
 marble shop, which he owned and operated until 2006; in his leisure
 time, he delighted in hunting, fishing, and watching a wide variety
 of sports; an athlete himself in his younger years, he won the
 featherweight championship in the Golden Gloves Boxing Tournament
 in 1953; and
 WHEREAS, A caring husband and father and a hardworking
 entrepreneur, Buddy Whatley leaves his loved ones with a wealth of
 fond memories that they will forever hold close to their hearts;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Madren Boyce Whatley
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to his many relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Buddy
 Whatley.
 Wray
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 711 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 16, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House