House | 03/17/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed |