Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR829 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/27/2017

                            H.R. No. 829


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The untimely death of beloved coach Johnathan Ray
 Wagner on December 11, 2016, at the age of 30, has deeply saddened
 his family, his friends, and the many students whose lives he
 touched throughout his career in the Angleton Independent School
 District; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Ray and Sandy Wagner on June 11, 1986, J. R.
 Wagner grew up in Angleton and graduated from Angleton High School
 in 2004; he went on to attend Sam Houston State University, where he
 earned a degree in kinesiology with a minor in history in 2009; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wagner subsequently returned to his hometown
 and took a job at Angleton Junior High as a football coach and
 physical education teacher; his enthusiasm, his dedication to his
 students and players, and his Wildcats team pride made him a popular
 figure on campus, and he naturally fit into the role of mentor and
 confidant to many; and
 WHEREAS, While pursuing the career of his dreams, Mr. Wagner
 was fortunate enough to meet his future wife, Katy, and the couple
 exchanged wedding vows on July 11, 2015; in addition to enjoying the
 company of his family and friends, he took pleasure in the outdoors
 and spent many happy hours fishing; and
 WHEREAS, Those who were fortunate enough to know J. R. Wagner
 will never forget the laughter, love, and happiness that he shared
 with them, and he will forever hold a treasured place in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Johnathan Ray Wagner
 and extend heartfelt condolences to all those who mourn his
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of J. R.
 Wagner.
 Bonnen of Brazoria
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 829 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 23, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House