House | 05/02/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1525 | |
House | 01/13/2017 | Filed |