Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR928 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/28/2017

                            H.R. No. 928


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of admired educator Shirley Jane Sloan Hamm of Pittsburg on
 March 7, 2017, at the age of 82; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Clarksville on June 19, 1934, she completed
 both her bachelor's degree and her master's degree in library
 science at East Texas State University; she married her high school
 sweetheart, Harvey David Hamm, on August 15, 1954, and they became
 the proud parents of two children, Harvey and Melinda; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Hamm taught English in Dallas and then in
 Pittsburg schools, where she also served as a librarian; while
 instilling a love of language in children, she demonstrated a
 special understanding of those who struggled for acceptance and
 made them feel included; many of her former students kept in touch
 through the years, and the hundreds of valentines she received from
 them were displayed seasonally in the windows of the shop owned by
 her daughter and son-in-law; and
 WHEREAS, In her retirement, Mrs. Hamm continued to share her
 love of literature with her grandchildren, Jennifer, Michael, and
 Mitchell, and her great-grandchildren, Josie, Kenlie, Kennady,
 Kynslee, Noah, and Keyton; she had a Kindle full of books but often
 visited the public library with her great-grandchildren in tow, and
 in her last days, she made sure a dear friend returned three books
 she had checked out; when not reading, she enjoyed traveling with
 her husband as members of the Shriner's RV Club, and the couple
 hosted legendary Christmas breakfasts for family and friends; in
 addition, she liked to invite friends for tea, and she beautified
 the world around her by painting, repairing antique furniture,
 gardening, and arranging flowers; she played a key role in the
 continuation of the Green Thumb Garden Club and its annual flower
 show, and, having mastered the tricky Hogarth Curve design, she won
 many awards for her arrangements; and
 WHEREAS, Devoted to her family, friends, and students,
 Shirley Hamm enriched the lives of innumerable people, and those
 who were privileged to know her will forever treasure their
 memories of her dry wit, frankness, and wisdom; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Shirley Jane Sloan
 Hamm and extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her passing; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Shirley
 Hamm.
 Hefner
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 928 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 23, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House