Senate | 05/09/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 340 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 326 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |