E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5761
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1986
|
Journal Page: 5760
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5760
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3902
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5586
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5586
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2254
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4015
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1465
|
Journal Page: 4014
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4014
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Workman
|
Journal Page: 4014
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4014
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Amended
|
3-Workman
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3919
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Perry
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|