E
|
05/18/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
E
|
05/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#741
|
Journal Page: 2528
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2528
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2528
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2419
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/3/17 5:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2370
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1704
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|