E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1624
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-VanDeaver
|
Journal Page: 4400
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4400
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-VanDeaver
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|