E | 05/19/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/19/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2226 | |
E | 05/10/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3152 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1727 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1019 | Journal Page: 2914 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2849 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2849 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2665 | Journal Page: 2849 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1687 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1155 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |