Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1021 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Nelson S.B. No. 1021
2- (Price)
1+S.B. No. 1021
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to reports on the consolidation and certain functions of
86 the health and human services system, including advisory committees
97 within the system, and the re-creation of the Texas system of care
108 framework.
119 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1210 SECTION 1. Section 531.0051(c), Government Code, is amended
1311 to read as follows:
1412 (c) The council is composed of:
1513 (1) the executive commissioner;
1614 (2) the director of each division established by the
1715 executive commissioner under Section 531.008(c);
1816 (3) the commissioner of a health and human services
1917 agency; [and]
2018 (4) the commissioner of the Department of Family and
2119 Protective Services, regardless of whether that agency continues as
2220 a state agency separate from the commission; and
2321 (5) other individuals appointed by the executive
2422 commissioner as the executive commissioner determines necessary.
2523 SECTION 2. Sections 531.02031(a) and (b), Government Code,
2624 are amended to read as follows:
2725 (a) Not later than July 31 [September 1], 2018, the
2826 executive commissioner shall conduct a study and submit a report
2927 and recommendations [recommendation] to the Health and Human
3028 Services Transition Legislative Oversight Committee that include:
3129 (1) a recommendation regarding the need to continue
3230 the Department of Family and Protective Services as a state agency
3331 separate from the commission, unless a determination on the
3432 continuation is made before that date;
3533 (2) a recommendation regarding the need to continue
3634 [and] the Department of State Health Services as a state agency
3735 [agencies] separate from the commission;
3836 (3) an assessment of the quality and consistency of
3937 data sharing, communication, and coordination between the
4038 Department of Family and Protective Services and the commission;
4139 and
4240 (4) an assessment of any known or potential conflicts
4341 of interest concerning licensing and regulation activities by the
4442 Department of Family and Protective Services or the commission,
4543 including the process by which known conflicts of interest are
4644 mitigated or managed by those agencies.
4745 (b) Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human
4846 Services Transition Legislative Oversight Committee shall review
4947 the report and recommendations [recommendation] submitted under
5048 Subsection (a) and submit a report and recommendations
5149 [recommendation] to the legislature that include:
5250 (1) a recommendation regarding the need to continue
5351 the Department of Family and Protective Services as a state agency
5452 separate from the commission, unless a determination on the
5553 continuation is made before that date;
5654 (2) a recommendation regarding the need to continue
5755 [and] the Department of State Health Services as a state agency
5856 [agencies] separate from the commission; and
5957 (3) an assessment of and any necessary recommendations
6058 concerning data sharing, communication, and coordination between
6159 the Department of Family and Protective Services and the
6260 commission.
6361 SECTION 3. Section 531.251, Government Code, is reenacted
6462 to read as follows:
6563 Sec. 531.251. TEXAS SYSTEM OF CARE FRAMEWORK. (a) In this
6664 section:
6765 (1) "Minor" means an individual younger than 18 years
6866 of age.
6967 (2) "Serious emotional disturbance" means a mental,
7068 behavioral, or emotional disorder of sufficient duration to result
7169 in functional impairment that substantially interferes with or
7270 limits a person's role or ability to function in family, school, or
7371 community activities.
7472 (3) "System of care framework" means a framework for
7573 collaboration among state agencies, minors who have a serious
7674 emotional disturbance or are at risk of developing a serious
7775 emotional disturbance, and the families of those minors that
7876 improves access to services and delivers effective community-based
7977 services that are family-driven, youth- or young adult-guided, and
8078 culturally and linguistically competent.
8179 (b) The commission shall implement a system of care
8280 framework to develop local mental health systems of care in
8381 communities for minors who are receiving residential mental health
8482 services and supports or inpatient mental health hospitalization,
8583 have or are at risk of developing a serious emotional disturbance,
8684 or are at risk of being removed from the minor's home and placed in a
8785 more restrictive environment to receive mental health services and
8886 supports, including an inpatient mental health hospital, a
8987 residential treatment facility, or a facility or program operated
9088 by the Department of Family and Protective Services or an agency
9189 that is part of the juvenile justice system.
9290 (c) The commission shall:
9391 (1) maintain a comprehensive plan for the delivery of
9492 mental health services and supports to a minor and a minor's family
9593 using a system of care framework, including best practices in the
9694 financing, administration, governance, and delivery of those
9795 services;
9896 (2) enter memoranda of understanding with the
9997 Department of State Health Services, the Department of Family and
10098 Protective Services, the Texas Education Agency, the Texas Juvenile
10199 Justice Department, and the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders
102100 with Medical or Mental Impairments that specify the roles and
103101 responsibilities of each agency in implementing the comprehensive
104102 plan described by Subdivision (1);
105103 (3) identify appropriate local, state, and federal
106104 funding sources to finance infrastructure and mental health
107105 services and supports needed to support state and local system of
108106 care framework efforts;
109107 (4) develop an evaluation system to measure
110108 cross-system performance and outcomes of state and local system of
111109 care framework efforts; and
112110 (5) in implementing the provisions of this section,
113111 consult with stakeholders, including:
114112 (A) minors who have or are at risk of developing a
115113 serious emotional disturbance or young adults who received mental
116114 health services and supports as a minor with or at risk of
117115 developing a serious emotional disturbance; and
118116 (B) family members of those minors or young
119117 adults.
120118 SECTION 4. Not later than July 31, 2018, the executive
121119 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
122120 submit to the Health and Human Services Transition Legislative
123121 Oversight Committee the report required by Section 531.02031(a),
124122 Government Code, as amended by this Act. The report must also
125123 include:
126124 (1) the latest information available on the
127125 commission's progress in transferring and consolidating the
128126 administrative support services functions of the health and human
129127 services system as mandated by Subchapter A-1, Chapter 531,
130128 Government Code; and
131129 (2) recommendations on:
132130 (A) whether to abolish each statutory advisory
133131 committee that considers issues related to the health and human
134132 services system; and
135133 (B) for an advisory committee for which
136134 abolishment is recommended, whether to reestablish the advisory
137135 committee by rule, consolidate the advisory committee with another
138136 advisory committee, or permanently discontinue the advisory
139137 committee in any form.
140138 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
141139 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
142140 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
143141 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
144142 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
143+ ______________________________ ______________________________
144+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
145+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1021 passed the Senate on
146+ May 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
147+ ______________________________
148+ Secretary of the Senate
149+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1021 passed the House on
150+ May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one
151+ present not voting.
152+ ______________________________
153+ Chief Clerk of the House
154+ Approved:
155+ ______________________________
156+ Date
157+ ______________________________
158+ Governor