Senate | 05/08/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |