Senate | 05/02/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |