LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1051
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1051
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1051
Compare Versions
SB1051 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1051 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1051 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB1051 Comm Sub May 12, 2017
SB1051 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB1051 Comm Sub March 23, 2017
SB1051 Introduced February 23, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB1051 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1051 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1051 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB1051 Comm Sub May 12, 2017
SB1051 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB1051 Comm Sub March 23, 2017
SB1051 Introduced February 23, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare