Senate | 05/25/2017 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 3147 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1753 | Journal Page: 4640 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Amended | 1-Schofield | Journal Page: 4640 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4542 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#1701 | Journal Page: 4541 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Amended | 1-Murr | Journal Page: 4540 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4540 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |