Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1067 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1067
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 2, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of the Chisholm Trail Special Utility
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 7219 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 7219.  CHISHOLM TRAIL SPECIAL UTILITY DISTRICT
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7219.001.  DEFINITIONS.  In this chapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the district's board of directors.
 (2)  "City" means the City of Georgetown.
 (3)  "District" means the Chisholm Trail Special
 Utility District.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICT
 Sec. 7219.051.  PROPOSAL FOR DISSOLUTION; NOTICE. (a)  If a
 majority of the board votes to propose to dissolve the district, the
 board may issue notice of a hearing on a proposal to dissolve the
 district.
 (b)  Not later than the 14th day before the date set for the
 hearing, notice of the hearing must:
 (1)  be posted at the courthouse of each county in which
 the district is located and at the district's office; and
 (2)  be published at least one time in a newspaper of
 general circulation in each county in which the district is
 located.
 Sec. 7219.052.  HEARING AND ORDER. (a)  At the hearing,
 held at the time and place stated in the notice under Section
 7219.051, the board shall:
 (1)  hear all interested persons;
 (2)  consider whether the best interests of the persons
 and property in the district will be served by dissolving the
 district; and
 (3)  vote on whether to dissolve the district.
 (b)  If two-thirds of the members of the board vote to
 dissolve the district, the board shall enter a finding in its
 records that the district will be dissolved after completion of the
 process to transfer to the city the district's certificate of
 convenience and necessity and other assets and liabilities under
 Section 7219.053.  After the district's certificate of convenience
 and necessity and other assets and liabilities are transferred to
 the city under Section 7219.053, the board shall enter an order in
 its records dissolving the district.
 (c)  If two-thirds of the members of the board do not vote to
 dissolve the district, the board shall enter an order in its records
 providing that the district is not to be dissolved.
 Sec. 7219.053.  ASSUMPTION OF OPERATION, MANAGEMENT, AND
 ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF DISTRICT.  (a)  On the date the board
 enters a finding under Section 7219.052(b) that the district will
 be dissolved, the city shall assume:
 (1)  control of the operation and management of the
 affairs of the district, to the extent that the operation and
 management was not previously assumed by the city by contractual
 agreement;
 (2)  all rights, duties, and obligations of the
 district, including existing contracts, duties, assets, property,
 easements, financial obligations, and liabilities of the district,
 to the extent that those rights, duties, and obligations were not
 previously assumed by the city by contractual agreement;
 (3)  all files, records, and accounts of the district,
 including those that pertain to the control, finances, management,
 and operation of the district; and
 (4)  all permits, approvals, and licenses of the
 district.
 (b)  To the extent that the assumption of an item listed in
 Subsection (a) requires the approval of a state agency, the state
 agency shall grant approval without additional notice or hearing.
 (c)  This section does not enhance or harm the position of a
 contracting party.
 Sec. 7219.054.  REVIEW OF BOARD'S ORDER.  The board's order
 dissolving the district is final and may not be appealed in any
 manner to any judicial, administrative, or other tribunal if the
 board's order is entered after the completion of the process to
 transfer the district's certificate of convenience and necessity,
 including any necessary approval of a state agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *