E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3390
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3390
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3390
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2916
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1020
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Frullo
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2491
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2455
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2455
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 428
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 428
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|