E | 05/22/2017 | Effective on 1/1/18 | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2574 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3385 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1876 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1904 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1092 | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2920 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2920 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 2381 | Journal Page: 2920 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 992 |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |