House | 05/24/2017 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 13(c) | Journal Page: 4555 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Bell | Journal Page: 4555 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4555 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 946 |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |