Senate | 05/11/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |