E | 06/12/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4245 | |
E | 05/28/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
Senate | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3794 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3699 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3152 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1814 | Journal Page: 4808 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4808 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4808 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4789 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4789 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |