E
|
05/31/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/31/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6060
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5953
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#2031
|
Journal Page: 5953
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5951
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5951
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3790
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1359
|
Journal Page: 3789
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3789
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3789
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1339
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
27-Dukes
|
Journal Page: 3711
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
26-Dukes
|
Journal Page: 3708
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amended
|
25-Swanson, et al.
|
Journal Page: 3707
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3707
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
24-Swanson
|
Journal Page: 3706
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
11-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 3695
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
12-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3685
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1150
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 381
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA9 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 380
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 362
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 268
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 235
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 174
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 150
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 120
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 39
|
Senate
|
12/07/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|