E | 06/12/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4245 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2493 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#1562 | Journal Page: 4206 |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4206 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4205 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4118 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4118 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Postponed | 5/21/17 9:09 PM | Journal Page: 4108 |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4108 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 431 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 431 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |