E
|
05/27/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
E
|
05/19/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3885
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3782
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2104
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2104
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2104
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2099
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1143
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2697
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 682
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|