House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|