House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |