House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3153 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 434 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 434 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |