LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1148
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1148
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1148
Compare Versions
SB1148 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1148 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1148 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB1148 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB1148 Engrossed April 27, 2017
SB1148 Comm Sub April 24, 2017
SB1148 Introduced February 28, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB1148 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1148 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1148 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB1148 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB1148 Engrossed April 27, 2017
SB1148 Comm Sub April 24, 2017
SB1148 Introduced February 28, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare