House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |