E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5726
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1971
|
Journal Page: 5725
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5725
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference comm. report again filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3841
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House recommits to conf. comm.-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House recommits to conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5580
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate recommits to conf. comm.-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5681
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate recommits to conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3628
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5510
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5510
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3213
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3213
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3213
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3212
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4198
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1551
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4197
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4108
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amended
|
3-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4107
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4107
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|