House | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 3602 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3602 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3389 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1916 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1835 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |