E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3797
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4625
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1734
|
Journal Page: 4624
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4624
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4623
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4623
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4503
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1686
|
Journal Page: 4503
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4503
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
3-Workman, Deshotel, and Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4497
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hall
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1167
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1167
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 462
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 462
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|