E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3141
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1549
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4104
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4104
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|