E
|
05/22/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
E
|
05/11/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3385
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1790
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2763
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2455
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2455
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1302
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1302
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|