LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1232
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1232
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1232
Compare Versions
SB1232 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1232 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1232 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB1232 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB1232 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB1232 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB1232 Introduced March 3, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB1232 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1232 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1232 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB1232 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB1232 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB1232 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB1232 Introduced March 3, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare